U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:08-cr-00032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Harrison
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • April 16, 2025: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • April 01, 2025: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Appeal Remark]
  • March 31, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 19, 2025: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 18, 2025: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 18, 2025: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • March 18, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2025
  • January 29, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 10, 2022: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • March 10, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 24, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • February 24, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • February 24, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 24, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • February 24, 2022: [Unseal Document]
  • February 24, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 23, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.