U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00103-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DUKE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Digital Audio File]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 25, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • October 20, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 08, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • May 11, 2022: [Digital Audio File]
  • May 10, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 22, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 28, 2022: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 01, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 04, 2022: [Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 09, 2021: [Bond]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • December 09, 2021: [Trial Order]
  • December 09, 2021: [Digital Audio File]
  • December 09, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 09, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 06, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • November 01, 2021: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.