U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00129-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Alvarado-Zacarias
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 16, 2022: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 13, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 13, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 07, 2022: [Sentencing]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Digital Audio File]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • December 15, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 15, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 13, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
  • December 06, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 06, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 09, 2021: [Digital Audio File]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • November 09, 2021: [Trial Order]
  • November 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 09, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • November 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 02, 2021: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • November 02, 2021: [Restricted Document]
  • November 02, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.