U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00128-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hernando-Zavala
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 12, 2022: [Sentencing]
January, 2022
  • January 30, 2022: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 12, 2022: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • January 11, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 11, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 06, 2022: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • January 04, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 04, 2022: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Trial Order]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 29, 2021: [Continue]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order]
  • November 24, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 09, 2021: [Digital Audio File]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • November 09, 2021: [Trial Order]
  • November 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 09, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • November 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 02, 2021: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • November 02, 2021: [Restricted Document]
  • November 02, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.