U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00125-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thomas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order]
  • December 05, 2022: [Restricted Document]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order]
  • August 03, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • August 03, 2022: [Competency Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Psychiatric Report]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 07, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 11, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Psychiatric Exam]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 07, 2021: [Continue]
  • December 07, 2021: [Notice of Intent to Request Redaction re Transcript]
  • December 07, 2021: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • November 08, 2021: [Trial Order]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order]
  • November 04, 2021: [Waiver of Appearance at Arraignment Entry of Not Guilty Plea]
  • November 04, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 04, 2021: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • November 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 02, 2021: [Restricted Document]
  • November 02, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.