U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00127-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jones
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Remark]
  • November 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 21, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 18, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 18, 2022: [Sentencing]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 04, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 04, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 04, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • July 15, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 15, 2022: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
  • July 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 12, 2022: [Continue]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Continue]
  • May 16, 2022: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 14, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 08, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Trial Order]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 30, 2021: [Continue]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order]
  • November 24, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 09, 2021: [Digital Audio File]
  • November 09, 2021: [Trial Order]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • November 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 09, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • November 03, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 02, 2021: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • November 02, 2021: [Restricted Document]
  • November 02, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.