U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00126-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hart
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 03, 2024: [Digital Audio File]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 19, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Continue]
  • November 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • September 14, 2022: [In Limine]
  • September 13, 2022: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • September 08, 2022: [Exhibit List]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
  • June 21, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 10, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 27, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 21, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 19, 2022: [Continue]
  • April 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • March 15, 2022: [Suppress]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 19, 2022: [Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 16, 2021: [Continue]
  • December 07, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Digital Audio File]
  • November 19, 2021: [Consent By Videoconference]
  • November 19, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • November 19, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 18, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • November 17, 2021: [Trial Order]
  • November 16, 2021: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • November 16, 2021: [Restricted Document]
  • November 16, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted]
  • November 15, 2021: [Waiver of Appearance at Arraignment Entry of Not Guilty Plea]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 04, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 03, 2021: [Restricted Document]
  • November 03, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.