U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00127-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Harper
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 20, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 12, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 12, 2022: [Sentencing]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 17, 2022: [Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • December 16, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • December 16, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 16, 2021: [Waiver of Counsel]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order]
  • December 16, 2021: [Consent By Videoconference]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order]
  • December 15, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 15, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 15, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 15, 2021: [Digital Audio File]
  • December 14, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 14, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 13, 2021: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • December 13, 2021: [Information - Felony]
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 09, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 18, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 05, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 04, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.