U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lacy, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 02, 2025: [CJA Appointment Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 02, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • May 01, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Continue]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order]
  • January 10, 2023: [Competency Hearing]
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 08, 2022: [Notice of Insanity Defense]
  • December 06, 2022: [Psychiatric Report]
  • December 06, 2022: [Telephone Conference]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • April 08, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Trial Order]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 12, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 24, 2022: [Digital Audio File]
  • February 24, 2022: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • February 24, 2022: [Trial Order]
  • February 24, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 24, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 11, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 09, 2022: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • February 09, 2022: [Restricted Document]
  • February 09, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.