U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nichols
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • March 26, 2025: [Rebuttal]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 20, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • March 20, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 20, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 20, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 19, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 18, 2025: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • March 18, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Writ]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 19, 2023: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 09, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 27, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Reply to Response]
  • August 25, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • August 17, 2022: [Dismiss]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 08, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 25, 2022: [Continue]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 29, 2022: [Bond]
  • April 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 21, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 21, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 14, 2022: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 14, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 14, 2022: [Trial Order]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 14, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 14, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • April 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 12, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 12, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • April 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.