U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00125-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cumberland
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Reduce Sentence - 2023 USSC Amendment 821]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 18, 2023: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 18, 2023: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 18, 2023: [Suppress]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Trial Order]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 06, 2022: [Continue]
  • October 04, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 03, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 26, 2022: [Digital Audio File]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • September 26, 2022: [Trial Order]
  • September 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 26, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • September 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 21, 2022: [Restricted Document]
  • September 21, 2022: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • September 21, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.