U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00120-4
  • Case Name: USA v. Rice
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Digital Audio File]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 21, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 14, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 11, 2025: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 07, 2025: [Sealed Transcript]
  • April 07, 2025: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 22, 2023: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • January 22, 2023: [Order on Motion to Review of Magistrate Judge Order]
  • January 19, 2023: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 19, 2023: [Compel]
  • January 18, 2023: [Reply to Response]
  • January 18, 2023: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 18, 2023: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 17, 2023: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 17, 2023: [Continue]
  • January 16, 2023: [Attachment]
  • January 16, 2023: [Continue]
  • January 16, 2023: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 12, 2023: [Continue]
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [Continue]
  • January 10, 2023: [Review of Magistrate Judge Order]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Continue]
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 22, 2022: [Trial Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 22, 2022: [Continue]
  • November 21, 2022: [Continue]
  • November 17, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 16, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 16, 2022: [Continue]
  • November 15, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 25, 2022: [Restricted Document]
  • October 25, 2022: [Bond]
  • October 25, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 25, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 24, 2022: [Restricted Document]
  • October 24, 2022: [Bond]
  • October 24, 2022: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit (Sealed)]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • October 24, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • October 24, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 21, 2022: [Digital Audio File]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • October 21, 2022: [Substitute Attorney]
  • October 21, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 20, 2022: [Continue]
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • October 20, 2022: [Substitute Attorney]
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • October 19, 2022: [Substitute Attorney]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • October 19, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • October 19, 2022: [Trial Order]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 19, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 19, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 19, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • October 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • October 19, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • October 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.