U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00130-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WARNOCK, JR., et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Hearing]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • May 09, 2025: [Travel]
  • May 01, 2025: [Restricted Motion]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • April 24, 2025: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Discovery]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 16, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 15, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 10, 2025: [Sealed Transcript]
  • April 08, 2025: [Sealed Transcript]
  • April 08, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • March 20, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • March 19, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 18, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 18, 2025: [Sever Defendant]
  • March 18, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 18, 2025: [Bill of Particulars]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 18, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 17, 2025: [Bill of Particulars]
December, 2024
  • December 10, 2024: [Restricted Motion]
October, 2024
  • October 23, 2024: [Response in Opposition]
  • October 09, 2024: [Withdraw Document]
  • October 04, 2024: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • October 04, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 04, 2024: [In Limine]
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • December 21, 2022: [Substitute Attorney]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 19, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • December 16, 2022: [Continue]
  • December 12, 2022: [Continue]
  • December 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 01, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 01, 2022: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Digital Audio File]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 30, 2022: [Bond]
  • November 30, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • November 30, 2022: [Trial Order]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 30, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 30, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • November 30, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 22, 2022: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • November 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 22, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 22, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 22, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 21, 2022: [Digital Audio File]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 21, 2022: [Bond]
  • November 21, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • November 21, 2022: [Trial Order]
  • November 21, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • November 21, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 21, 2022: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • November 21, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.