U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-00013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Caston
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 15, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Digital Audio File]
  • October 07, 2024: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 06, 2024: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 04, 2024: [Judgment]
  • October 04, 2024: [Statement of Reasons]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.