U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-00120-6
  • Case Name: USA v. Spivey, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Digital Audio File]
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 08, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 08, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 08, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 07, 2025: [Judgment]
  • May 07, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 01, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 29, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 24, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 23, 2025: [Sealed Motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • April 23, 2025: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 22, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 21, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
  • April 07, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
  • April 07, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
  • April 02, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
  • April 01, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 28, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 25, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.