U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00053-8
  • Case Name: USA v. Naylor, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Remark]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 09, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 07, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 06, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 06, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Appeal Remark]
  • March 24, 2025: [Letter]
  • March 24, 2025: [Appeal Remark]
  • March 19, 2025: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 17, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 11, 2025: [Supplemental Record Sent USCA]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 11, 2024: [Digital Audio File]
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 10, 2024: [Continue]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 09, 2024: [Continue]
  • October 08, 2024: [Continue]
  • October 07, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.