U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00126-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gonzalez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Trial Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • October 09, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice of Judicial Assignment]
  • October 07, 2024: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.