U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-00114-5
  • Case Name: USA v. Campbell, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • May 05, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 29, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 28, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • April 25, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 24, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 17, 2025: [Exclude]
  • April 17, 2025: [In Limine]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 04, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 02, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 01, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
November, 2024
  • November 25, 2024: [Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.