U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00034-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Poole, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 22, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 15, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 15, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 09, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 07, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 01, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 01, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 01, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • March 28, 2025: [Discovery]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 09, 2024: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • October 09, 2024: [Substitute Attorney]
  • October 09, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 09, 2024: [Bond]
  • October 09, 2024: [Trial Order]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • October 09, 2024: [Brady Order]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 09, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 09, 2024: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 08, 2024: [Arraignment]
  • October 08, 2024: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • October 08, 2024: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.