U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00038-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McCuin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Appeal Remark]
  • May 05, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 02, 2025: [Response]
  • May 02, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 22, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Appeal Remark]
  • April 11, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 09, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 07, 2025: [Quash]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Conditions of Release]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 31, 2025: [Waiver of Counsel]
  • March 31, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 28, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 24, 2025: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • March 24, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 19, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 19, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • March 14, 2025: [Remark]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial]
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • October 08, 2024: [Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.