U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-00118-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Powell, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 08, 2025: [Continue]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 23, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Review of Magistrate Judge Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Digital Audio File]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 17, 2025: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 13, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • March 11, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 11, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 11, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 10, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
February, 2025
  • February 23, 2025: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
January, 2025
  • January 30, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • January 22, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • January 22, 2025: [In Limine]
October, 2024
  • October 20, 2024: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
  • October 11, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 11, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 09, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.