U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00126-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bivins et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Trial Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 28, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 24, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 15, 2025: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit (Sealed)]
  • April 15, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • April 10, 2025: [Substitute Attorney]
  • April 10, 2025: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • April 10, 2025: [Brady Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 10, 2025: [Trial Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 10, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 10, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 10, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.