U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00007-5
  • Case Name: USA v. Kitchens, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Judgment]
  • May 01, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 29, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 29, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 28, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 14, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 14, 2025: [Continue]
February, 2025
  • February 08, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2024
  • December 12, 2024: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 11, 2024: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 09, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.