U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-00075-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moore
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Speedy Trial]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 06, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • May 05, 2025: [Continue]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 22, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Motion Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.