U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00055-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Khalaf
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • March 27, 2025: [Jury Verdict (Redacted)]
  • March 27, 2025: [Jury Verdict (Un-Redacted)]
  • March 27, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • March 26, 2025: [Jury Trial]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 25, 2025: [Reply to Response]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • March 24, 2025: [Reply to Response]
  • March 24, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • March 24, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 23, 2025: [Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • March 20, 2025: [Reply to Response]
  • March 20, 2025: [In Limine]
  • March 20, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 19, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 19, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 13, 2025: [In Limine]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.