U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fridie
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 02, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 02, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 28, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
  • April 21, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 18, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 13, 2025: [Response]
  • April 07, 2025: [In Limine]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 01, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
November, 2024
  • November 29, 2024: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Continue]
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.