U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00094-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Leake
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 17, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 15, 2025: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • April 15, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 15, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 14, 2025: [Digital Audio File]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Trial Order]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 09, 2024: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.