U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00029-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Spivery
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 26, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 26, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 19, 2025: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • March 19, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 19, 2025: [Sentencing]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • October 10, 2024: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 10, 2024: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 10, 2024: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 10, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.