U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00141-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pfetzer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • March 22, 2025: [Sealed Transcript]
  • March 17, 2025: [Transcript - Appeal]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.