U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00034
  • Case Name: Secherest et al v. City of Lexington et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • May 14, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • May 08, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • May 08, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 07, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • May 06, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 29, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
  • April 24, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 22, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY]
  • April 15, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • April 15, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 11, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 01, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Remark]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • March 21, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 21, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
December, 2024
  • December 02, 2024: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • October 11, 2024: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY]
  • October 11, 2024: [Memorandum in Support]
  • October 11, 2024: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 10, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.