U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00075
  • Case Name: Anderson v. Bernius et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • March 25, 2025: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 11, 2024: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 10, 2024: [Extend Deadline]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.