U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00038-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Robinson, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • April 09, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 09, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 09, 2025: [Digital Audio File]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • March 27, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 27, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
January, 2025
  • January 21, 2025: [Continue]
  • January 16, 2025: [Continue]
October, 2024
  • October 26, 2024: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • October 10, 2024: [Waiver of Appearance at Arraignment Entry of Not Guilty Plea]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.