U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00332
  • Case Name: Downs v. Penniman et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Service of Designation of Experts]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
  • April 11, 2025: [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
  • April 10, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 08, 2025: [Subpoena Returned]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena]
November, 2024
  • November 05, 2024: [Answer to Intervenor Complaint]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.