U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00559
  • Case Name: The 733, LLC v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Service of Interrogatories]
  • April 08, 2025: [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadline]
  • April 04, 2025: [Extend Deadline]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Service of Designation of Experts]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 11, 2024: [Leave to File Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.