U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-02967
  • Case Name: Jack v. City of Meridian
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Remark]
  • April 14, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 14, 2025: [Sanctions]
  • April 08, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Pretrial Conference]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.