U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gheorge et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 25, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 23, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 17, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 16, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 16, 2025: [Sentencing]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.