U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00318
  • Case Name: Brown v. Hinds County, Mississippi et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • May 06, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 06, 2025: [Continue]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Subpoena Returned]
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Service of Designation of Experts]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Service of Designation of Experts]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Admissions]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadline]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Extend Deadline]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Admissions]
January, 2025
  • January 06, 2025: [Extend Deadline]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice of Service of Request for Production]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.