U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-03092
  • Case Name: Moore v. Jackson Public School District et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 13, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 09, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • May 04, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
  • April 21, 2025: [Stay Proceedings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Admissions]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 15, 2025: [Remark]
  • April 11, 2025: [Remark]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Service of Request for Production]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Service of Interrogatories]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 09, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 09, 2025: [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • April 09, 2025: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • April 09, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 09, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 08, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 08, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 08, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Leave to File Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.