U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00224
  • Case Name: Velasquez et al v. Martinez et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • May 15, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Service of Designation of Experts]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 15, 2025: [Telephonic Discovery Conference]
  • April 14, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Service of Interrogatories]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Service of Request for Production]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Service of Designation of Experts]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY]
  • March 13, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • March 13, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 13, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 13, 2025: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.