U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00061
  • Case Name: Heavy Equipment Movers and Installation, LLC v. Calgon Carbon Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice of Service of Interrogatories]
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice of Service of Request for Production]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 28, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 14, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Rebuttal]
  • April 07, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Rebuttal]
  • April 04, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 03, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 28, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 20, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 19, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena]
  • October 11, 2024: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 11, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.