U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00239
  • Case Name: Gregory et al v. Pinnacle Climate Technologies, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 13, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 09, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 09, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • May 09, 2025: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 06, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 05, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 02, 2025: [Case Management Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 02, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 01, 2025: [Dismiss]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 23, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 22, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • April 22, 2025: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • April 18, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 18, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 17, 2025: [Vacate]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 15, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 15, 2025: [Crossclaim]
  • April 14, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 11, 2025: [Amended Scheduling Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Remark]
  • April 04, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order of Recusal]
  • April 04, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 02, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 02, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 02, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
October, 2024
  • October 28, 2024: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • October 11, 2024: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.