U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00233
  • Case Name: Smith et al v. Freeman et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • May 08, 2025: [Extend Deadline]
  • May 08, 2025: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 25, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Service of Designation of Experts]
  • April 16, 2025: [Strike]
  • April 16, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 09, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • April 09, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • March 27, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadline]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 24, 2025: [Extend Deadline]
  • March 21, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 14, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 13, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 13, 2025: [Partial Summary Judgment]
February, 2025
  • February 02, 2025: [Notice of Service of Designation of Experts]
October, 2024
  • October 12, 2024: [Entry of Default]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.