U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00241
  • Case Name: McCain v. Mary Mahoney's, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 03, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 02, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 25, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 14, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 13, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 13, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 13, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 13, 2025: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Summons Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.