U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00163
  • Case Name: Priest v. Walmart Stores East, LP et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 15, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • May 12, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 01, 2025: [Response to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [In Limine]
  • April 24, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Rebuttal]
  • March 17, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 10, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 10, 2025: [Strike]
  • March 10, 2025: [Rebuttal]
February, 2025
  • February 27, 2025: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • February 24, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Notice to Take Deposition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.