U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00375
  • Case Name: McMillion v. Pascagoula Gautier School District
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Exclude]
  • April 08, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 08, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
February, 2025
  • February 04, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY]
  • October 14, 2024: [Compel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.