U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00056
  • Case Name: Carter v. City of McComb, Mississippi
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadline]
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • May 02, 2025: [Extend Deadline]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 09, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Subpoena Returned]
  • March 25, 2025: [Subpoena Returned]
  • March 14, 2025: [Subpoena Returned]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Request for Waiver of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.