U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00092
  • Case Name: Baptist Homes, Inc. v. City of Madison, Mississippi et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • May 13, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice of Service of Request for Production]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Service of Request for Production]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Service of Interrogatories]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
  • April 10, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 08, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Service of Interrogatories]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Service of Request for Production]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Admissions]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.