U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-03071
  • Case Name: Shelton v. Kroger Limited Partnership I et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 09, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadline]
  • March 13, 2025: [Extend Deadline]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 14, 2024: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.