U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00143
  • Case Name: Phillips v. D&T Transportation Services, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
  • May 15, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • May 14, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • May 13, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Service of Designation of Experts]
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Case Management Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadline]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • April 11, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • April 08, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Service of Designation of Experts]
  • April 01, 2025: [Extend Deadline]
  • April 01, 2025: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
January, 2025
  • January 20, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 14, 2024: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.