U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00489
  • Case Name: McKinney v. The Mississippi School for Mathematics and Science et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Service of Request for Production]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Service of Interrogatories]
  • April 01, 2025: [Case Management Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Telephonic Case Management Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Service of Request for Production]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Service of Interrogatories]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
October, 2024
  • October 18, 2024: [Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.